CA AB1035 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1714.28 of the Civil Code, relating to civil liability, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
COVID-19 emergency: small businesses: immunity from civil liability.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1035 Mayes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1586.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1714.28 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |