CA AB1035 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 60603 and 60642.6 of, and to add Section 60642.7 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil assessment.
Title
Pupil assessments: interim assessments: purposes of use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1035 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1035 O'Donnell By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1035 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1035 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1035 O'Donnell By Allen (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1035 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1035 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3211.). |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3206.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2711.). |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2024.). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1997.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60642.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60642.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |