CA AB1033 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11346.3 of the Government Code, relating to state agency regulations.
Title
Economic impact assessment: small business definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1033 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1033 Eduardo Garcia (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Assembly - AB 1033 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1033 Eduardo Garcia (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Assembly - AB 1033 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Jobs, Economic Development and The Economy (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6025.). |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4643.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3442.) |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and TRANS. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11346.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63090 | New Code | See Bill Text |