CA AB1031 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 226.77 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee rest periods: employees providing direct support to individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2024-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2023-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2023-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2023-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2023-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code226.77New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback