CA AB1031 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 18220 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies: interns and student assistants: hiring preference.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1031 Villapudua Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1031 Villapudua et al. By Jones (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1031 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
2021-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1695.) (June 28).
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1337.)
2021-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2021-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code18220Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback