CA AB1031 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 1773) to Chapter 7.5 of Division 2 of the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Sections 18741, 18742, and 18744 of, and to add and repeal Article 5.2 (commencing with Section 18749) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income taxes: voluntary contributions: Rare and Endangered Species Preservation Program: Native California Wildlife Rehabilitation Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] |
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1031 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1031 Waldron et al. By Atkins (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - ? (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1031 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1031 Waldron et al. By Atkins (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - ? (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1031 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3113.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2498.). |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 31) |
2017-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1618.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 27). |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1773 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18742 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18744 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18749 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |