CA AB1031 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 22892.1 to the Government Code, relating to public employee health benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Employees' Medical and Hospital Care Act: contracting entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 1031 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1031 Thurmond By McGuire (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1031 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-15 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2015-10-10 Vetoed by Governor.
2015-09-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-04AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2919.).
2015-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2015-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2454.).
2015-06-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-23SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-21SenateReferred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and APPR.
2015-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1380.)
2015-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2015-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code22892.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1031&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20150226_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20150622_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20150909_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20150506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20150511_0107PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20150608_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20150903_1158AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20150904_1038AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback