CA AB1031 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-02-03 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 54950 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: open meetings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyDied at Desk.
2013-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2013-02-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
2013-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54950Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback