CA AB1031 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 23153.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: driving under the influence (DUI):

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2012-01-10 In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
2011-04-26 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-03-14 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2011-02-20 From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2011-02-18 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code23153.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback