CA AB1031 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2830 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-08 - Assembly - AB 1031 BLUMENFIELD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1031 Blumenfield By Strickland (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1031 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-09-29 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2009-09-08 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3100.)
2009-09-03 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-09-02 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2107.)
2009-09-01 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-31 Read third time, amended. To second reading.
2009-07-23 Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
2009-07-16 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
2009-06-18 Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
2009-06-03 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-02 Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1989.)
2009-06-01 Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2009-05-29 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
2009-05-20 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-05-06 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-05-05 Read second time and amended.
2009-05-04 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2009-04-23 Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2009-04-22 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
2009-03-26 Referred to Com. on U. & C.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1031&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20090422_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20090505_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20090601_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20090723_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20090831_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20090910_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20090427_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20090528_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20090602_0601PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20090707_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20090902_1135AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1031_vote_20090908_0449PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback