CA AB1030 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 26 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 10.8 (commencing with Section 750) to Chapter 1 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pelvic examinations: informational pamphlet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1030 Calderon Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-15SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-08-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2019-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-23SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-04-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1404.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2248.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2249Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code750New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback