CA AB1030 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2837.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Energy storage systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2837.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |