CA AB103 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 33, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 33, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2021 (Chapters 21, 69, and 240 of the Statutes of 2021) by amending Items 6100-001-0890, 6610-001-0001, and 7760-101-0001 of Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.10 of, that act, and to amend the Budget Act of 2022 (Chapters 43, 45, and 249 of the Statutes of 2022) by amending Items 0250-001-0001, 3360-001-3228, 3360-101-3228, 5225-019-0001, 5225-022-0001, 6100-001-0001, 6100-001-0178, 6100-001-0890, 6100-004-0001, 6100-125-0890, 6100-172-0001, 6100-194-0001, 6100-196-0001, 6100-488, 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, of Section 2.00 of, and amending Sections 19.56, 19.58, 39.00, and 39.10 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Acts of 2021 and 2022.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Assembly - AB 103 TING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB103 Ting By Skinner (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 103 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 103 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB103 Ting By Skinner (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 103 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 103 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 33, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 2415.). |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2415.) |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2415.) |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1762.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Senate Rules Suspended (Ayes 32. Noes 8.) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 26). |
2023-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 830.) |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.) |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |