CA AB103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4003 and 4004 of, and to add Section 1026.2 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment benefits, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Unemployment compensation benefits: COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 103 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB103 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 103 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB103 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 103 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4967.). |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4954.) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3857.). |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 24). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1179.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1026.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |