CA AB1029 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65589.9 of the Government Code, relating to housing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing elements: prohousing local policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1029 Mullin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1029 Mullin et al. By Becker Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1029 Mullin Third Reading Urgency (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17.).
2021-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-26SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-09SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16.).
2021-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 12).
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-04-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65589.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback