CA AB1029 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16350 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts and estates.
Title
Trusts and estates: allocations of receipts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Assembly - AB 1029 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1029 Maienschein By Anderson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1029 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1029 Maienschein By Anderson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1029 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 105, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2287.). |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1602.). |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1158.) |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 16350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |