CA AB1025 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1113, 1126, 1127, 1136, 1140, 1156, 1156.6, 1157, 1157.1, 1157.5, 1158.1, 1171, 1171.5, 1176, 1180, 1180.3, 1180.6, 1181, 1182, 1183, 1191, 1196, 1196.1, and 1196.3 of, to amend and renumber Section 1159.1 of, to add Section 1171.6 to, and to repeal Section 1142 of, the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to bar pilots, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Harbors and ports: inland pilots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1025 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1025 Skinner By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1025 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1025 Skinner By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1025 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-02 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2846.). | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2127.). | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1344.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-27 | Measure version as amended on April 13 corrected. | |
2011-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-13 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11). | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |