CA AB1021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12301.17 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.
Title
In-home supportive services: application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1021 Baker et al. By Wiener (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1021 BAKER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1021 BAKER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 146, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2075.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1618.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |