CA AB1017 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 118501 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local government.
Title
Public restrooms: Right to Restrooms Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1017 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1017 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 8). |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 3. Page 1778.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 118501 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |