CA AB1015 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22507.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Parking: car share vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1015 Bloom (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1015 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1015 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 41, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1491.). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1263.) |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22507.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |