CA AB1014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 41514.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diesel backup generators: health facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1014 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1014 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
2017-07-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2023.).
2017-07-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and EQ.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-09AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and NAT. RES.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code41514.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback