CA AB1013 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 906, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 3016.5 and 3116.5 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote accessible vote by mail system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1013 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1013 Low By Chang (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1013 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 906, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6827.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5821.).
2018-08-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-04-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-23SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.)
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code3016.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code3116.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code3517Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback