CA AB101 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51225.3 and 51226.7 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: high school graduation requirements: ethnic studies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 101 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB101 Medina et al. By Durazo (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 101 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB101 Medina et al. By Durazo (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 101 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2893.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2892.) |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2892.) |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2482.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 14). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 9. Page 1623.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 7). |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 11. |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51226.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |