CA AB1008 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12952 to the Government Code, and to repeal Section 432.9 of the Labor Code, relating to employment discrimination.
Title
Employment discrimination: conviction history.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
Asm. Shirley Weber [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1008 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1008 McCarty et al. By Bradford (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1008 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1008 McCarty et al. By Bradford (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1008 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 789, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 3483.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2855.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 11). |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 33. Page 2071.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12952 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 432.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |