CA AB1001 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1558 of, and to add Sections 1522.09 and 1556.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 11165.7 and 11166 of the Penal Code, relating to child abuse.
Title
Child abuse: reporting: foster family agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1001 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1001 Maienschein By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1001 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1001 Maienschein By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1001 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6286.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5237.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3509.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1522.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1550.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1554 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1556.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1558 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11165.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11166 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10605.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |