CA AB100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 116876 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drinking water: endpoint devices: lead content.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 100 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB100 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 100 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.).
2021-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-23SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-07AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
2020-12-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code116876New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback