CA AB10 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12206, 17058, 17561, 23610.5, and 24692 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income taxes: credits low-income housing: farmworker housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 10 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2019-03-28AssemblyMeasure version as revised on March 27 corrected.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-03-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback