AZ SM1003 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Electrical grids; security; strengthening
Title
Electrical grids; security; strengthening
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Damage
Electrical Grid
Electromagnetic Pulse (emp)
Memorial
Natural Solar Event
Physical Assault
Security
Strengthen
Electrical Grid
Electromagnetic Pulse (emp)
Memorial
Natural Solar Event
Physical Assault
Security
Strengthen