AZ SCR1049 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-23 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Fire districts; funding; TPT increment
Title
Fire districts; funding; TPT increment
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | House LARA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-1-1-1-0-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |