AZ SCR1044 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tuition; postsecondary education
Title
Tuition; postsecondary education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-27-0-0) |
2021-05-06 | House | House read second time |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Board Of Regents
Classification (h)
Classification Of Students
Community College
Concurrent Resolution (h)
Immigration Status
In-state Students (h)
In-state Tuition
Postsecondary Education
Students (h)
Tuition
Tuition Purposes
Classification (h)
Classification Of Students
Community College
Concurrent Resolution (h)
Immigration Status
In-state Students (h)
In-state Tuition
Postsecondary Education
Students (h)
Tuition
Tuition Purposes