AZ SCR1043 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional property tax exemptions
Title
Constitutional property tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-0-5-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Constitutional Property Tax Exemptions
Property Tax Exemptions
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona
Repeal
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Constitutional Property Tax Exemptions
Property Tax Exemptions
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of Arizona
Repeal