AZ SCR1039 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HCR2047
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Lindsey Perry; auditor general
Title
Lindsey Perry; auditor general
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HCR2047 (Replaces) 2018-05-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass