AZ SCR1025 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Parents' bill of rights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parents' bill of rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09HouseHouse read second time
2023-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2023-03-08HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2023-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2023-03-02HouseTransmit to House
2023-03-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2023-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2023-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2023-02-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2023-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2023-02-14SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2023-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2023-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2023-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2023-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback