AZ SCR1025 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Article V convention; term limits
Title
Article V convention; term limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Article V Convention
Constitution Of The United States
Convention
Term Limits
United States Representatives
United States Senators
Constitution Of The United States
Convention
Term Limits
United States Representatives
United States Senators