AZ SCR1019 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional property tax exemptions
Title
Constitutional property tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |