AZ SCR1014 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Article V convention; term limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Article V convention; term limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-02-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0)
2019-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback