AZ SCR1010 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Nuclear energy; support

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuclear energy; support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2017-04-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-04-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-22-6-0)
2017-04-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-28HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-03-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-03-21HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2017-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-06SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2017-01-30SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-26SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2017-01-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69028
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/scr1010p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/scr1010s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/scr1010.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.scr1010nrew.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.scr10100136.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69028&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69028&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69028&billStatusActionId=175938&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69028&billStatusActionId=175609&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69028&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69028&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69028&billStatusActionId=177087&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69028&billStatusActionId=177282&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback