AZ SCR1005 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State; municipal corporation; industrial pursuits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State; municipal corporation; industrial pursuits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-27HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-26HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07SenateSenate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70066
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scr1005p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scr1005s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.scr10050303.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.scr1005gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.scr1005livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.scr1005appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70066&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70066&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70066&billStatusActionId=182482&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70066&billStatusActionId=182516&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70066&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback