AZ SCR1004 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Beirut bombing; remembrance day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beirut bombing; remembrance day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-03-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-26HouseHouse MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House MVRA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-01HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-01SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-01-30SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-29SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-22SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69831
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scr1004p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scr1004s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/scr1004.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69831&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69831&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69831&billStatusActionId=180071&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69831&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69831&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69831&billStatusActionId=182583&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback