AZ SCR1004 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cold war victory day
Title
Cold war victory day
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2010-04-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-07 | House third reading , voting: (45-10-5-0) | |
2010-04-06 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-1-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-01-25 | Transmit to House | |
2010-01-25 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-1-2-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-01-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Senate VMA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |