AZ SCR1003 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (13-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (13-15-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Executive orders; emergencies; reauthorization; termination
Title
Executive orders; emergencies; reauthorization; termination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma motioned that the House suspend Rules 8(K), 32 and 36 and Senate Concurrent Resolution 1003 be placed on the active calendar for Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma motioned that the House suspend Rules 8(K), 32 and 36 and Senate Concurrent Resolution 1003 be placed on the active calendar for Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate final reading FAILED, voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-25-4-0) |
2021-06-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma motioned that the House suspend Rules 8(K), 32 and 36 and Senate Concurrent Resolution 1003 be placed on the active calendar for Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. |
2021-06-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Emergency
Executive Orders
Governor
Legislative Special Session
Powers And Duties
Reauthorization
State Of Emergency
Termination
Constitution Of Arizona
Constitutional Amendments (arizona)
Emergency
Executive Orders
Governor
Legislative Special Session
Powers And Duties
Reauthorization
State Of Emergency
Termination