AZ SCM1016 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Rulemaking; electric generating units; opposition
Title
Rulemaking; electric generating units; opposition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2016-04-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate WE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate WE Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WE Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |