AZ SCM1012 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Nogales wastewater fairness act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nogales wastewater fairness act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-04-09SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-09SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-05SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-20HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-01HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-28HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-02-12SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-08SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70689
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scm1012p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scm1012s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/scm1012h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/scm1012.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.scm1012bowers.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.scm1012energy environment and natural resources.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70689&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70689&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70689&billStatusActionId=181911&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70689&billStatusActionId=181937&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70689&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70689&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70689&billStatusActionId=183022&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70689&billStatusActionId=183043&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70689&billStatusActionId=183139&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70689&billStatusActionId=183137&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback