AZ SCM1002 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Federal lands; forgone revenue; education.
Title
Federal lands; forgone revenue; education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House FR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House FR Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Congress
Education
Federal Lands
Forgone Revenue
Long-term Funding
Payment In Lieu Of Taxes (pilt) Program
Education
Federal Lands
Forgone Revenue
Long-term Funding
Payment In Lieu Of Taxes (pilt) Program