AZ SB1845 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2919
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrition assistance; benefit match.
Title
Nutrition assistance; benefit match.
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1845 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1845 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 396 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-2-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1845 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2919 (Replaces) 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2919 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Subjects
Benefit Match
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Incentives
Nutrition Assistance
Snap
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Welfare - Title 46
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Incentives
Nutrition Assistance
Snap
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Welfare - Title 46