AZ SB1830 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2922
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 383
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Credit for donation.
Title
Credit for donation.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1830 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1830 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Chapter 383 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (47-9-4-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1830 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2922 (Replaces) 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2922 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Subjects
Credit For Donation
Income Tax
Internal Revenue Code
Purpose
Retroactivity
S Corporations
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Income Tax
Internal Revenue Code
Purpose
Retroactivity
S Corporations
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1089.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1181 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |