AZ SB1824 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2896
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022
Title
Health; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 409 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-1-0) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2896 (Replaces) 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
2021-2022
Accomodations Required
Administration
Adult Developmental Homes
Ahcccs
Allocation Of Grant Monies
Altcs
Annual Distribution Report
Annual Expenditure Report
Annual Medical Loss Ratio
Annual Report
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Article Application
Assisted Living Facilities
Assisted Living Facilities Managers
Blood Test
Board Of Examiners
Board Of Examiners Of Nursing Care Institution Administrators
Budget Reconciliation
Cash Benefits
Child Developmental Homes
Child Safety - Title 8
Community Developmental Disability Services
Compensation
Competency Restoration
Comprehensive Health Plan Expenditure Authority Fund
Counties
County Acute Care Contributions
County Contributions
County Expenditure Limitations
Covid-19
Covid-19 Vaccine
Definition
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Denial Of License
Department
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Public Safety
Department Of Revenue
Developmental Homes
Disproportionate Share Payments
Drug Testing
Eligibility
Emergency Use Authorization
Employers
Exceptions
Exclusion
Exemption
Federal Monies
Fee
Fee Reduction
Fiscal Year 2021-2022
General Provisions
Governor's Office Of Strategic Planning And Budgeting
Group Homes
Health
Health Budget Reconciliation
Health Services Lottery Monies Fund
Human Papillomavirus
Immunizations
Implementation
Insurance - Title 20
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Justice Reinvestment Fund
Juvenile Group Homes
Labor - Title 23
Legislative Intent
Licensure Requirements
Medical Marijuana Fund
Meetings
Methodology
Newborn Screening Program
Nursing Care Institution And Assisted Living Facility Study Committee
Posting
Power - Title 30
Program Administrator
Prohibition
Prohibitions
Proposition 204
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Purpose
Qualifications
Quorum
Recipients
Recommended Uniform Screening Panel
Repeal
Report
Requirements
Retroactivity
Reversion
Revocation Of License
Rish Contingency Rate Setting
Service Providers
Sexual Violence Service Fund
Sexual Violence Services
Skilled Nursing Facility
Smart And Safe Arizona Fund
State Government - Title 41
State Long-term Care Ombudsman
State Treasurer
Supreme Court
Suspension Of License
Tanf
Termination
Terms
Third-party Contractors
Transfer
United States Food And Drug Administration
Use
Vacancies
Vaccine Passport
Welfare - Title 46
Accomodations Required
Administration
Adult Developmental Homes
Ahcccs
Allocation Of Grant Monies
Altcs
Annual Distribution Report
Annual Expenditure Report
Annual Medical Loss Ratio
Annual Report
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations (h)
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Article Application
Assisted Living Facilities
Assisted Living Facilities Managers
Blood Test
Board Of Examiners
Board Of Examiners Of Nursing Care Institution Administrators
Budget Reconciliation
Cash Benefits
Child Developmental Homes
Child Safety - Title 8
Community Developmental Disability Services
Compensation
Competency Restoration
Comprehensive Health Plan Expenditure Authority Fund
Counties
County Acute Care Contributions
County Contributions
County Expenditure Limitations
Covid-19
Covid-19 Vaccine
Definition
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Denial Of License
Department
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Public Safety
Department Of Revenue
Developmental Homes
Disproportionate Share Payments
Drug Testing
Eligibility
Emergency Use Authorization
Employers
Exceptions
Exclusion
Exemption
Federal Monies
Fee
Fee Reduction
Fiscal Year 2021-2022
General Provisions
Governor's Office Of Strategic Planning And Budgeting
Group Homes
Health
Health Budget Reconciliation
Health Services Lottery Monies Fund
Human Papillomavirus
Immunizations
Implementation
Insurance - Title 20
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Justice Reinvestment Fund
Juvenile Group Homes
Labor - Title 23
Legislative Intent
Licensure Requirements
Medical Marijuana Fund
Meetings
Methodology
Newborn Screening Program
Nursing Care Institution And Assisted Living Facility Study Committee
Posting
Power - Title 30
Program Administrator
Prohibition
Prohibitions
Proposition 204
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Purpose
Qualifications
Quorum
Recipients
Recommended Uniform Screening Panel
Repeal
Report
Requirements
Retroactivity
Reversion
Revocation Of License
Rish Contingency Rate Setting
Service Providers
Sexual Violence Service Fund
Sexual Violence Services
Skilled Nursing Facility
Smart And Safe Arizona Fund
State Government - Title 41
State Long-term Care Ombudsman
State Treasurer
Supreme Court
Suspension Of License
Tanf
Termination
Terms
Third-party Contractors
Transfer
United States Food And Drug Administration
Use
Vacancies
Vaccine Passport
Welfare - Title 46
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 654 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 147 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 148 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 592 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 594 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 694 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 694.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 512.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |