AZ SB1821 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal justice; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022
Title
Criminal justice; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-1-0) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
2021-2022
Annual Report
Annual Reports
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations (h)
Baseline Calculations
Baseline Probation Failure Rate
Body Cameras
Border Security Fund
Budget Reconciliation
Civilian Review Board
Consent
Contracted Entities
Coordinated Reentry Planning Services Programs
Counties - Title 11
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Crime Scene Dna Sample
Criminal Code - Title 13
Criminal Justice
Cross-system Recidivism Tracking Database
Cyber Response Revolving Fund
Cyber-attack
Definitions
Delayed Repeal (h)
Department Of Public Safety
Digital Evidence Storage
Discipline
Document Storage
Evidence (h)
Evidence-based Practices
Exemption
Fee
General Adjudication Personnel And Support Fund
Inmate Eligibility
Investigation
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Juries - Title 21
Law Enforcement Officer
Marginal Cost Of Incarceration
Membership
Mental Health Transition Pilot Program
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Military Installation Fund
National Guard
Payments And Grants
Planning Committee
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Probation Programming
Probation Success Incentive
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Purpose
Qualifications
Rapid Dna Testing
Redactions
Reimbursement
Release
Repeal
Report
Request Requirements
Required Training
Rules
School Safety Interoperability Fund
School Safety Pilot Program
State Department Of Corrections
State General Fund
State Government - Title 41
Statewide Concern
Study
Supreme Court
Video Recordings
Waters - Title 45
Annual Report
Annual Reports
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations (h)
Baseline Calculations
Baseline Probation Failure Rate
Body Cameras
Border Security Fund
Budget Reconciliation
Civilian Review Board
Consent
Contracted Entities
Coordinated Reentry Planning Services Programs
Counties - Title 11
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Crime Scene Dna Sample
Criminal Code - Title 13
Criminal Justice
Cross-system Recidivism Tracking Database
Cyber Response Revolving Fund
Cyber-attack
Definitions
Delayed Repeal (h)
Department Of Public Safety
Digital Evidence Storage
Discipline
Document Storage
Evidence (h)
Evidence-based Practices
Exemption
Fee
General Adjudication Personnel And Support Fund
Inmate Eligibility
Investigation
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Juries - Title 21
Law Enforcement Officer
Marginal Cost Of Incarceration
Membership
Mental Health Transition Pilot Program
Military Affairs And Emergency Management - Title 26
Military Installation Fund
National Guard
Payments And Grants
Planning Committee
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Probation Programming
Probation Success Incentive
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Purpose
Qualifications
Rapid Dna Testing
Redactions
Reimbursement
Release
Repeal
Report
Request Requirements
Required Training
Rules
School Safety Interoperability Fund
School Safety Pilot Program
State Department Of Corrections
State General Fund
State Government - Title 41
Statewide Concern
Study
Supreme Court
Video Recordings
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 117.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 284.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 284.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 700 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 1414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 183 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1734 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1772 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |