AZ SB1794 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Historic race wagering
Title
Historic race wagering
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Definitions
Department Of Gaming
Exemption From Rulemaking
Free Play
Gross Revenue
Historic Race Wagering
Permittees
Position
Racetracks
Racing
Revenue Sharing
Rules
Severability
Teletrack Facility
Teletracking
Terminals
Definitions
Department Of Gaming
Exemption From Rulemaking
Free Play
Gross Revenue
Historic Race Wagering
Permittees
Position
Racetracks
Racing
Revenue Sharing
Rules
Severability
Teletrack Facility
Teletracking
Terminals
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text |