AZ SB1793 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration databases; death records
Title
Voter registration databases; death records
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Antifraud (h)
Appropriations (h)
Causes For Cancellation (h)
Conduct Of Elections (h)
County Recorder
Database (h)
Death Records
Department Of Administration (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Equipment (h)
Exemption (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
State Registrar (h)
Vital Records (h)
Vital Records Systems (h)
Voter Registration
Voter Registration Databases
Appropriations (h)
Causes For Cancellation (h)
Conduct Of Elections (h)
County Recorder
Database (h)
Death Records
Department Of Administration (h)
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Equipment (h)
Exemption (h)
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
State Registrar (h)
Vital Records (h)
Vital Records Systems (h)
Voter Registration
Voter Registration Databases
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |